Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 05/01/2001
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33]* 05/01/2001
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 05/01/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 05/01/2001
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 05/01/2001
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9]* 05/01/2001
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 05/01/2001
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 05/01/2001
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 05/01/2001
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 05/01/2001
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 05/01/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 05/01/2001
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 05/01/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4]* 05/01/2001
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3]* 05/01/2001
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 05/01/2001
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 05/01/2001
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 05/01/2001
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 05/01/2001
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 05/01/2001
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 05/01/2001
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 05/01/2001
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 05/15/2001
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/15/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/15/2001
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 05/15/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 05/15/2001
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 05/15/2001
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 06/12/2001
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 06/12/2001
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 06/12/2001
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 09/10/2001
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 12/11/2001
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 12/11/2001
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 12/11/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 12/13/2001
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 01/29/2002
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 04/09/2002
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 04/09/2002
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 04/09/2002
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 04/16/2002
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/16/2002
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/16/2002
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 06/05/2002
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 06/13/2002
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 06/25/2002