Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 05/02/2001
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1]* 05/02/2001
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 06/06/2001
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 06/13/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/25/2001
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 06/26/2001
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 06/28/2001
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 07/10/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 07/10/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 07/10/2001
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 07/17/2001
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 02/13/2002
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 02/26/2002
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 03/19/2002
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 04/09/2002