Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5]* 05/02/2001
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 05/02/2001
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 05/02/2001
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 05/02/2001
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13]* 05/02/2001
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 05/02/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 05/02/2001
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 05/02/2001
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 05/02/2001
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 05/02/2001
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 05/02/2001
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 05/02/2001
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 05/02/2001
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 05/02/2001
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 05/02/2001
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34]* 05/02/2001
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 05/02/2001
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 05/02/2001
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24]* 05/02/2001
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 05/02/2001
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 05/02/2001
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 05/02/2001
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14]* 05/02/2001
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 05/02/2001
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25]* 05/02/2001
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 05/02/2001
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 05/02/2001
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13]* 05/02/2001
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2]* 05/02/2001
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 05/02/2001
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 05/02/2001
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 05/08/2001
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 05/08/2001
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 05/08/2001
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 05/08/2001
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 05/08/2001
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 05/08/2001
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 05/08/2001
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 05/16/2001
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 05/16/2001
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 05/16/2001
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 05/16/2001
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 05/16/2001
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 05/16/2001
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 05/16/2001
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 05/24/2001
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 05/24/2001
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 05/24/2001
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 05/24/2001
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/24/2001
Rep. Sawyer, Tom [D-OH-14] 06/06/2001
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 06/06/2001
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 06/06/2001
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4] 06/28/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 07/30/2001
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 01/29/2002
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 05/02/2002