Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 05/09/2001
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 05/09/2001
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 05/09/2001
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 05/09/2001
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 05/09/2001
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 05/15/2001
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 05/15/2001
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 05/23/2001
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 05/23/2001
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 06/06/2001
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3] 06/06/2001
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 07/12/2001