Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26]* 01/03/2001
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 01/03/2001
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 01/03/2001
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47]* 01/03/2001
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4]* 01/03/2001
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 01/03/2001
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 01/03/2001
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 01/03/2001
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 01/03/2001
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5]* 01/03/2001
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5]* 01/03/2001
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 01/03/2001
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 01/03/2001
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 01/03/2001
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4]* 01/03/2001
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13]* 01/03/2001
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 01/30/2001
Rep. Grucci, Felix J., Jr. [R-NY-1] 02/06/2001
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 02/07/2001
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 02/13/2001
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 02/27/2001
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 03/06/2001
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 04/03/2001
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 04/03/2001
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 04/04/2001
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 04/24/2001
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 04/24/2001
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 05/01/2001
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 05/02/2001
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 05/08/2001
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 05/10/2001
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 05/15/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 05/15/2001
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 05/17/2001
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 05/21/2001
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 05/22/2001
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-2] 05/23/2001
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 05/23/2001
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 05/23/2001
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 06/05/2001
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 06/05/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/20/2001
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/21/2001
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 06/25/2001
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 06/26/2001
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 07/19/2001
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 07/19/2001
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 09/06/2001
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 09/28/2001
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 10/09/2001
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 12/13/2001
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 01/29/2002
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 03/05/2002
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 04/09/2002
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 04/16/2002
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 05/07/2002
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 06/06/2002
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 06/25/2002
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 06/25/2002
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 06/25/2002
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 06/26/2002
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 06/26/2002
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 06/26/2002
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 06/27/2002
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 06/27/2002
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 07/08/2002
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 07/18/2002
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 07/25/2002
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 10/08/2002