Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 05/02/2001
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 05/02/2001
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24]* 05/02/2001
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4]* 05/02/2001
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 05/02/2001
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 05/02/2001
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 05/02/2001
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 05/08/2001
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 05/08/2001
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 05/08/2001
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 05/16/2001
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 05/21/2001
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 05/23/2001
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 04/23/2002