Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 05/03/2001
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2]* 05/03/2001
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4]* 05/03/2001
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 05/03/2001
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1]* 05/03/2001
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 05/03/2001
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11]* 05/03/2001
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24]* 05/03/2001
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23]* 05/03/2001
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 05/03/2001
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3]* 05/03/2001
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 05/03/2001
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-1] 06/20/2001
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 06/25/2001
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 06/26/2001
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 06/27/2001
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 07/10/2001
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 07/10/2001