Refine your search

8 results for Actions Overview
Date Actions Overview
05/28/2001 Became Public Law No: 107-11.
05/28/2001 Signed by President.
05/23/2001 Presented to President.
05/22/2001 Resolving differences -- House actions: On motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to by voice vote.(text as House agreed to Senate amendment: CR H2391)
05/21/2001 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
05/21/2001 Senate Committee on Energy and Natural Resources discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S5260-5262)
05/15/2001 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 400 - 15 (Roll no. 109).(text: CR H2155-2156)
05/03/2001 Introduced in House