Text: H.R.1696 — 107th Congress (2001-2002)All Bill Information (Except Text)

05/28/2001 Became Public Law No: 107-11

Bill text available as:

Shown Here:
Enrolled Bill


Formatting necessary for an accurate reading of this legislative text may be shown by tags (e.g., <DELETED> or <BOLD>) or may be missing from this TXT display. For complete and accurate display of this text, see the PDF or HTML/XML.




[Congressional Bills 107th Congress]
[From the U.S. Government Printing Office]
[H.R. 1696 Enrolled Bill (ENR)]

        H.R.1696

                      One Hundred Seventh Congress

                                 of the

                        United States of America


                          AT THE FIRST SESSION

         Begun and held at the City of Washington on Wednesday,
             the third day of January, two thousand and one


                                 An Act


 
    To expedite the construction of the World War II memorial in the 
                          District of Columbia.

    Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the 
United States of America in Congress assembled,

SECTION 1. APPROVAL OF WORLD WAR II MEMORIAL SITE AND DESIGN.

    Notwithstanding any other provision of law, the World War II 
memorial described in plans approved by the Commission of Fine Arts on 
July 20, 2000 and November 16, 2000, and selected by the National 
Capital Planning Commission on September 21, 2000 and December 14, 
2000, and in accordance with the special use permit issued by the 
Secretary of the Interior on January 23, 2001, and numbered NCR-NACC-
5700-0103, shall be constructed expeditiously at the dedicated Rainbow 
Pool site in the District of Columbia in a manner consistent with such 
plans and permits, subject to design modifications, if any, approved in 
accordance with applicable laws and regulations.

SEC. 2. APPLICATION OF COMMEMORATIVE WORKS ACT.

    Elements of the memorial design and construction not approved as of 
the date of enactment of this Act shall be considered and approved in 
accordance with the requirements of the Commemorative Works Act (40 
U.S.C. 1001 et seq.).

SEC. 3. JUDICIAL REVIEW.

    The decision to locate the memorial at the Rainbow Pool site in the 
District of Columbia and the actions by the Commission of Fine Arts on 
July 20, 2000 and November 16, 2000, the actions by the National 
Capital Planning Commission on September 21, 2000 and December 14, 
2000, and the issuance of the special use permit identified in section 
1 shall not be subject to judicial review.

                               Speaker of the House of Representatives.

                            Vice President of the United States and    
                                               President of the Senate.