Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5]* 01/03/2001
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 01/03/2001
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30]* 01/03/2001
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5]* 01/03/2001
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 01/30/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 01/30/2001
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 01/30/2001
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 01/30/2001
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 02/06/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 02/26/2001
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 02/27/2001
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 02/27/2001
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 02/27/2001
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 02/27/2001
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 02/27/2001
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 02/27/2001
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 03/06/2001
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/06/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 03/06/2001
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 03/13/2001
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 03/13/2001
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 03/13/2001
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 03/13/2001
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31] 03/19/2001
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 03/20/2001
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 03/22/2001
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 03/27/2001
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 03/27/2001
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 03/29/2001
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 04/03/2001
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 04/03/2001
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 04/24/2001
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 04/24/2001
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 04/24/2001
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 04/24/2001
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 04/24/2001
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 04/26/2001
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 05/01/2001
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 05/01/2001
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/01/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 05/08/2001
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 05/09/2001
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 05/10/2001
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/10/2001
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/16/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/23/2001
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 06/05/2001
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 06/12/2001
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 06/12/2001
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 06/19/2001
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 06/26/2001
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 07/10/2001
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/10/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 07/11/2001
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 07/11/2001
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 07/12/2001
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/16/2001
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 07/18/2001
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 07/18/2001
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 07/23/2001
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 07/24/2001
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 07/27/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 07/30/2001
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/30/2001
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-49] 09/05/2001
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 09/05/2001
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 09/05/2001
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 09/24/2001
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 09/24/2001
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 09/25/2001
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 10/03/2001
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 11/13/2001
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 01/23/2002
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 03/05/2002
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 03/12/2002
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/25/2002
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 04/25/2002
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 05/21/2002
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 07/23/2002
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 09/19/2002