Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 05/03/2001
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3]* 05/03/2001
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15]* 05/03/2001
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 05/03/2001
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1]* 05/03/2001
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1]* 05/03/2001
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 05/03/2001
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5]* 05/03/2001
Rep. Thune, John [R-SD-At Large]* 05/03/2001
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 05/03/2001
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8]* 05/03/2001
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5]* 05/03/2001
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 05/03/2001
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 05/16/2001
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 05/16/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 05/16/2001
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4] 05/16/2001
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 05/16/2001
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 05/16/2001
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 05/21/2001
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 05/21/2001
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 05/23/2001
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 05/24/2001
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 05/25/2001
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 05/25/2001
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/05/2001
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 06/05/2001
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 06/05/2001
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 06/05/2001
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 06/05/2001
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 06/05/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 06/05/2001
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/05/2001
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 06/05/2001
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 06/05/2001
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 06/05/2001
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 06/05/2001
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 06/05/2001
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/05/2001
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 06/07/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/07/2001
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 06/07/2001
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 06/07/2001
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 06/07/2001
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 06/07/2001
Rep. Kerns, Brian D. [R-IN-7] 06/07/2001
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/12/2001
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/12/2001
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 06/12/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 06/12/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/12/2001
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 06/12/2001
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/12/2001
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/14/2001
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 06/27/2001
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 06/27/2001
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 06/27/2001
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 06/27/2001
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 07/10/2001
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 07/10/2001
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 07/10/2001
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 07/17/2001
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 07/17/2001
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7] 07/17/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 07/17/2001
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/17/2001
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 07/17/2001
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 07/17/2001
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 07/19/2001
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/19/2001
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 07/24/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 07/24/2001
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/25/2001
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 07/25/2001
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 07/25/2001
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 07/27/2001
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-2] 07/30/2001
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 07/31/2001
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 07/31/2001
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 07/31/2001
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 08/01/2001
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31] 08/02/2001
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 08/02/2001
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 09/06/2001
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 09/06/2001
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 09/06/2001
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/06/2001
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 09/06/2001
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 09/06/2001
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 09/06/2001
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 09/06/2001
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 09/06/2001
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 09/06/2001
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/06/2001
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 09/06/2001
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 09/06/2001
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 09/06/2001
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 09/06/2001
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 09/06/2001
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-49] 09/10/2001
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27] 09/10/2001
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 09/21/2001
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 09/21/2001
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 09/24/2001
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 09/25/2001
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 10/02/2001
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 10/04/2001
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 10/10/2001
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 12/19/2001
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 12/20/2001
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 01/24/2002
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 01/24/2002
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 01/29/2002
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 01/29/2002
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 03/04/2002