Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5]* 05/03/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 05/03/2001
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 05/03/2001
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 05/03/2001
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11]* 05/03/2001
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4]* 05/03/2001
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 05/03/2001
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 05/03/2001
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5]* 05/03/2001
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1]* 05/03/2001
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 05/03/2001
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 05/03/2001
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6]* 05/03/2001
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 05/16/2001
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 05/16/2001
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 05/16/2001
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 05/16/2001
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 05/16/2001
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 05/16/2001
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 05/16/2001
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 05/16/2001
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 05/16/2001
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 05/16/2001
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 05/16/2001
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 05/16/2001
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 06/12/2001
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 06/12/2001
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 06/14/2001
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 06/14/2001
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 06/14/2001
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 06/14/2001
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 06/14/2001
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 06/14/2001
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 06/14/2001
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 06/14/2001
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 06/14/2001
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 06/14/2001
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 06/28/2001
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 06/28/2001
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 06/28/2001
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 06/28/2001
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 07/10/2001
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 07/10/2001
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 07/10/2001
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 07/10/2001
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 07/10/2001
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 07/17/2001
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 07/17/2001
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 07/17/2001
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 07/19/2001
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 07/27/2001
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 09/12/2001
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 09/12/2001
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 09/12/2001
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 10/04/2001
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 10/04/2001
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 10/04/2001
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 10/09/2001
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 11/29/2001
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 11/29/2001
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11] 02/12/2002
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 03/13/2002
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 03/20/2002
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/16/2002
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 05/16/2002
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 05/16/2002
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 05/16/2002
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 05/20/2002
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 05/20/2002
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 05/22/2002
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5] 05/22/2002
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 05/22/2002
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 05/22/2002
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 05/23/2002
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 05/23/2002
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 06/04/2002
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 06/04/2002
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 06/06/2002
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 06/11/2002
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 06/11/2002
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/11/2002
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 06/27/2002
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 06/27/2002