Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 05/03/2001
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47]* 05/03/2001
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 05/21/2001
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 06/19/2001
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 06/19/2001
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 06/28/2001
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 06/28/2001
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 05/16/2002
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 05/21/2002
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 09/24/2002