Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 05/03/2001
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 05/03/2001
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31]* 05/03/2001
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34]* 05/03/2001
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29]* 05/03/2001
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 05/03/2001
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 05/03/2001
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28]* 05/03/2001
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20]* 05/03/2001
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 05/03/2001
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46]* 05/03/2001
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33]* 05/03/2001
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42]* 05/03/2001
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 05/03/2001
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 05/08/2001
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 05/08/2001
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 05/08/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/08/2001
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/09/2001
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 05/09/2001
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/09/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 05/09/2001
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 05/09/2001
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 05/09/2001
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 05/15/2001
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 05/15/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 05/15/2001
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/15/2001
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 05/15/2001
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/15/2001
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 05/16/2001
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/16/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/16/2001
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 05/22/2001
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 05/22/2001
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 05/22/2001
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 05/23/2001
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 05/23/2001
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 05/24/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 05/25/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 06/06/2001
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 06/06/2001
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 06/06/2001
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 09/10/2001
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 09/10/2001