Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 05/03/2001
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 05/16/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 05/16/2001
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 05/16/2001
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 05/16/2001
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 05/16/2001
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 05/16/2001
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 05/16/2001
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 05/16/2001
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 05/16/2001
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/16/2001
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 05/16/2001
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 05/16/2001
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 05/16/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 05/16/2001
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 05/16/2001
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 05/16/2001
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 05/16/2001
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 05/16/2001
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 05/16/2001
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 05/16/2001
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/16/2001
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 05/16/2001
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 05/16/2001
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 05/16/2001
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/16/2001
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 05/16/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/16/2001
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/16/2001
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 05/16/2001
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 05/16/2001
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 05/16/2001
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/16/2001
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 05/16/2001
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/16/2001
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/17/2001
Rep. Grucci, Felix J., Jr. [R-NY-1] 05/17/2001
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 05/17/2001
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 05/17/2001
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3] 05/22/2001
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 05/22/2001
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/22/2001
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 05/22/2001
Rep. Kerns, Brian D. [R-IN-7] 05/22/2001
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 05/22/2001
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 05/25/2001
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 05/25/2001
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 05/25/2001
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 05/25/2001
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 05/25/2001
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 05/25/2001
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 05/25/2001
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 05/25/2001
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 05/25/2001
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 05/25/2001
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31] 05/25/2001
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 05/25/2001
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 05/25/2001
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/25/2001
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/25/2001
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 05/25/2001
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/05/2001
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 06/05/2001
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 06/05/2001
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 06/05/2001
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 06/05/2001
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 06/05/2001
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 06/05/2001
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 06/05/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 06/05/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 06/05/2001
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 06/05/2001
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 06/05/2001
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 06/05/2001
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/05/2001
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/05/2001
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 06/07/2001
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 06/07/2001
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 06/14/2001
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/14/2001
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 06/14/2001
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 06/14/2001
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 06/14/2001
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 06/14/2001
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 06/14/2001
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/21/2001
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 06/21/2001
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 06/26/2001
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 06/26/2001
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 06/26/2001
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 07/11/2001
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 07/11/2001
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 07/11/2001
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 07/19/2001
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 07/19/2001
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 07/19/2001
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 07/19/2001
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 07/19/2001
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 07/19/2001
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 07/24/2001
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 07/24/2001
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/24/2001
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 07/24/2001
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 07/24/2001
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 08/01/2001
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 08/01/2001
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 08/01/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 08/01/2001
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 08/01/2001
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 08/01/2001
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 08/01/2001
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 08/01/2001
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 08/01/2001
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 08/01/2001
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 09/10/2001
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 09/10/2001
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 10/02/2001
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 10/02/2001
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 10/12/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 10/12/2001
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 12/05/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 12/05/2001
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 01/29/2002
Rep. Sawyer, Tom [D-OH-14] 01/29/2002
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 01/29/2002
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 01/29/2002
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 02/07/2002
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 02/14/2002
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 03/07/2002
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 03/20/2002
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 04/11/2002
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 04/11/2002
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 04/11/2002
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 04/11/2002
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 04/11/2002
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 04/11/2002
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 04/11/2002
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 04/11/2002
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 04/18/2002
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 05/02/2002
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 05/02/2002
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 05/02/2002
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 05/02/2002
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 05/02/2002
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 05/02/2002
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/02/2002
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 05/02/2002
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 05/02/2002
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 05/02/2002
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 05/02/2002
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 05/02/2002
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/02/2002
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 05/02/2002
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 05/02/2002
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 05/02/2002
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 05/02/2002
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27] 05/02/2002
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 05/02/2002
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 05/02/2002
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 05/08/2002
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/08/2002
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 05/08/2002
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 05/08/2002
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 05/08/2002
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/08/2002
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 05/08/2002
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/08/2002
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 05/08/2002
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 05/08/2002
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/15/2002
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 05/15/2002
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 05/15/2002
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-49] 05/15/2002
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 05/15/2002
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 05/15/2002
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 05/23/2002
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 05/23/2002
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 05/23/2002
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 05/23/2002
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 06/04/2002
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 06/04/2002
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 06/04/2002
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 06/04/2002
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 06/04/2002
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 06/04/2002
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 06/18/2002
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/18/2002
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 06/18/2002
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 06/25/2002
Rep. Thune, John [R-SD-At Large] 06/27/2002
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 07/17/2002
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 07/23/2002
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/26/2002
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4] 09/10/2002
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 09/10/2002
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 09/10/2002
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 09/10/2002
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 09/26/2002
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 11/13/2002