There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Social Security Earnings Limit Repeal Act of 2001

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title II of the Social Security Act to eliminate the earnings test for individuals who have attained age 62.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
05/03/2001Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
05/10/2001Referred to the Subcommittee on Social Security.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
05/03/2001Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/03/2001Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (50)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 05/03/2001
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 05/03/2001
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 05/03/2001
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 05/24/2001
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 05/24/2001
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 05/24/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 05/24/2001
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 05/24/2001
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 05/24/2001
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 05/24/2001
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 05/24/2001
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 05/24/2001
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 05/24/2001
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-1] 05/24/2001
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 05/24/2001
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/28/2001
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 06/28/2001
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 06/28/2001
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 06/28/2001
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 06/28/2001
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 06/28/2001
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 06/28/2001
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 06/28/2001
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 06/28/2001
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 06/28/2001
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 06/28/2001
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-2] 06/28/2001
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 06/28/2001
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 07/19/2001
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 07/19/2001
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 07/19/2001
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 07/19/2001
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 07/19/2001
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15] 07/19/2001
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 07/27/2001
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 07/27/2001
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 07/27/2001
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 07/27/2001
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 07/27/2001
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 09/06/2001
Rep. Kerns, Brian D. [R-IN-7] 09/06/2001
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 09/06/2001
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 03/12/2002
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 03/12/2002
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 03/12/2002
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 03/13/2002
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 03/13/2002
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 04/10/2002
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 06/11/2002
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 09/11/2002

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means05/03/2001 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Social Security05/10/2001 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.1731.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1731. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/03/2001)

Social Security Earnings Limit Repeal Act of 2001 - Amends title II (Old Age, Survivors and Disability Insurance) (OASDI) of the Social Security Act to repeal the limitation on the amount of outside income which beneficiaries who have attained age 62 may earn (earnings test) without incurring a reduction in benefits.