Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16]* 05/03/2001
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 05/03/2001
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 05/03/2001
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 05/03/2001
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24]* 05/03/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 05/03/2001
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 05/03/2001
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 05/03/2001
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 05/03/2001
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 05/03/2001
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 05/03/2001
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 05/03/2001
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29]* 05/03/2001
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 05/03/2001
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2]* 05/03/2001
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 05/03/2001
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 05/03/2001
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 05/03/2001
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 05/03/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 05/03/2001
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11]* 05/03/2001
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 05/03/2001
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 05/03/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 05/03/2001
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 05/03/2001
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 05/17/2001
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 05/17/2001
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 05/21/2001
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/21/2001
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 05/24/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 05/24/2001
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 05/24/2001
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 05/24/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 06/14/2001
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 06/14/2001
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 06/14/2001
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 06/14/2001
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 06/20/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 06/20/2001
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 06/20/2001
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 07/18/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 08/02/2001
Rep. Sawyer, Tom [D-OH-14] 09/06/2001
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 09/12/2001
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 09/17/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 09/24/2001
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 11/13/2001
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 11/28/2001
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 04/22/2002
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 10/16/2002