Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 02/08/2001
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 02/08/2001
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 02/08/2001
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 02/08/2001
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 02/08/2001
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 02/08/2001
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-1] 02/08/2001
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 02/08/2001
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 02/08/2001
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 02/08/2001
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 02/08/2001
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 02/08/2001
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 03/08/2001
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 03/08/2001
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 03/08/2001
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 03/08/2001
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 03/08/2001
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 03/08/2001
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 04/24/2001
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 04/24/2001
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 04/24/2001
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 04/24/2001
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 04/24/2001
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 06/05/2001
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5] 06/06/2001
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 06/06/2001
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 06/20/2001
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 06/20/2001
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 06/26/2001
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 06/26/2001
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 06/26/2001
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 06/26/2001
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 06/26/2001
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 07/10/2001
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15] 07/17/2001
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 02/26/2002
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 03/20/2002
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 06/20/2002
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 11/14/2002