Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18]* 05/08/2001
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 05/08/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10]* 05/08/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 05/08/2001
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14]* 05/08/2001
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 05/08/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 05/08/2001
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 05/08/2001
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 05/08/2001
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 05/08/2001
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15]* 05/08/2001
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 05/08/2001
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 05/08/2001
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 05/08/2001
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5]* 05/08/2001
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7]* 05/08/2001
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13]* 05/08/2001
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 05/08/2001
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 05/08/2001
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 05/08/2001
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2]* 05/08/2001
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large]* 05/08/2001
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 05/08/2001
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6]* 05/08/2001
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 05/08/2001
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 05/08/2001
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 05/08/2001
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31]* 05/08/2001
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9]* 05/08/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 05/10/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/10/2001
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 05/10/2001
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 05/16/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 05/16/2001
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 05/22/2001
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 05/22/2001
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 05/25/2001
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-49] 06/12/2001
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/10/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 07/10/2001
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 07/24/2001
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/06/2001