There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to provide that ancestors and lineal descendants of past or present members of the Armed Forces shall be taken into account in determining whether a veterans' organization is exempt from tax.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
05/08/2001Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
05/08/2001Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/08/2001Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E745-746)
Action By: House of Representatives
05/08/2001Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (53)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 05/08/2001
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22]* 05/08/2001
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2]* 05/08/2001
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 05/08/2001
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4]* 05/08/2001
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24]* 05/08/2001
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 05/24/2001
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 05/24/2001
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5] 05/24/2001
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 05/24/2001
Rep. Sawyer, Tom [D-OH-14] 05/24/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/24/2001
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 05/24/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/24/2001
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 05/24/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 05/24/2001
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/25/2001
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 06/07/2001
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 06/07/2001
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 06/14/2001
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 06/14/2001
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 06/14/2001
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 06/14/2001
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 06/14/2001
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 06/14/2001
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 06/21/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 06/21/2001
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 06/28/2001
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 06/28/2001
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 09/05/2001
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-27] 09/05/2001
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 09/05/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 09/05/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 09/05/2001
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-5] 09/14/2001
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 09/14/2001
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 09/14/2001
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 09/21/2001
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 10/04/2001
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 10/17/2001
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 11/08/2001
Rep. Grucci, Felix J., Jr. [R-NY-1] 11/08/2001
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 11/29/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 12/05/2001
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 12/13/2001
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 12/13/2001
Rep. Kerns, Brian D. [R-IN-7] 01/23/2002
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 02/13/2002
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 02/13/2002
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 03/05/2002
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 03/12/2002
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 05/23/2002
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 10/03/2002

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means05/08/2001 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.1754.


Subjects (14)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1754. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/08/2001)

Amends the Internal Revenue Code to provide that ancestors and lineal descendants of past or present members of the armed forces shall be taken into account in determining whether a veterans' organization is exempt from tax.