Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11]* 05/08/2001
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 05/08/2001
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 05/08/2001
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 05/08/2001
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 05/08/2001
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 05/08/2001
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31]* 05/08/2001
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 05/08/2001
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 05/08/2001
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22]* 05/08/2001
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 05/08/2001
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 05/08/2001
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 05/08/2001
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30]* 05/08/2001
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2]* 05/08/2001
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 05/08/2001
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 05/08/2001
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28]* 05/08/2001
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 05/08/2001
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34]* 05/08/2001
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 05/08/2001
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large]* 05/08/2001
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 05/08/2001
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33]* 05/08/2001
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42]* 05/08/2001
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 05/08/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 05/08/2001
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 05/08/2001
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 05/08/2001
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 05/08/2001
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 05/08/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 05/08/2001
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 05/08/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/17/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 05/17/2001
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 05/24/2001
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 05/25/2001
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/06/2001
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 06/13/2001
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/13/2001
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 06/20/2001
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 06/20/2001
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 11/28/2001