Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 05/08/2001
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 05/08/2001
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 05/08/2001
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22]* 05/08/2001
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 05/08/2001
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18]* 05/08/2001
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 05/08/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 05/08/2001
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 05/08/2001
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13]* 05/08/2001
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6]* 05/08/2001
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 05/08/2001
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 05/08/2001
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9]* 05/08/2001
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15]* 05/08/2001
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 05/08/2001
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29]* 05/08/2001
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 05/08/2001
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 05/08/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 05/08/2001
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 05/08/2001
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 05/08/2001
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 05/08/2001
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 05/08/2001
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 05/08/2001
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 05/08/2001
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 05/08/2001
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22]* 05/08/2001
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 05/08/2001
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 05/08/2001
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3]* 05/08/2001
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 05/08/2001
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 06/13/2001
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 06/13/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 06/13/2001
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 06/13/2001
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 06/13/2001
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 06/13/2001
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 06/13/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 06/13/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 06/13/2001
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/13/2001
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/13/2001
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 06/13/2001
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 06/13/2001
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 06/13/2001
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 06/13/2001
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 06/28/2001
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 06/28/2001
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 06/28/2001
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 06/28/2001
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/28/2001
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 08/01/2001
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 08/01/2001
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-49] 08/01/2001
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 08/01/2001
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 08/01/2001
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-27] 09/25/2001
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/25/2001
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 09/25/2001
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 02/05/2002
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 04/23/2002
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 04/23/2002
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 04/23/2002
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 04/25/2002
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 04/30/2002
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/09/2002