Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 05/09/2001
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 05/09/2001
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 05/09/2001
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 05/09/2001
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2]* 05/09/2001
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2]* 05/09/2001
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 05/09/2001
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3]* 05/09/2001
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6]* 05/09/2001
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 05/09/2001
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 05/09/2001
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 05/09/2001
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17]* 05/09/2001
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 05/09/2001
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 05/09/2001
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 05/16/2001
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 05/16/2001
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 05/16/2001
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 05/16/2001
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 05/16/2001
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-48] 05/16/2001
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 05/16/2001
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 05/21/2001
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5] 05/21/2001
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 05/21/2001
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 05/21/2001
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 05/21/2001
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 05/21/2001
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 05/21/2001
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 05/22/2001
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 05/22/2001
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 05/22/2001
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 06/06/2001
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 06/06/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 06/06/2001
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 06/06/2001
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 06/06/2001
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 06/06/2001
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 06/06/2001
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 06/06/2001
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 06/06/2001
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 06/19/2001
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 06/25/2001
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 07/10/2001
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 07/10/2001
Rep. Sherwood, Don [R-PA-10] 07/23/2001
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 07/26/2001
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 07/30/2001
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 07/30/2001
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 07/30/2001
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6] 09/10/2001
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 09/19/2001