Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20]* 05/09/2001
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14]* 05/09/2001
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26]* 05/09/2001
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 05/09/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 05/09/2001
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 05/09/2001
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 05/09/2001
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7]* 05/09/2001
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43]* 05/09/2001
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 05/09/2001
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3]* 05/09/2001
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5]* 05/09/2001
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 05/09/2001
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9]* 05/09/2001
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 05/09/2001
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 05/09/2001
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 05/09/2001
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14]* 05/09/2001
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8]* 05/09/2001
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4]* 05/09/2001
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 05/09/2001
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4]* 05/09/2001
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 05/09/2001
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5]* 05/09/2001
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 05/09/2001
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4]* 05/09/2001
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24]* 05/09/2001
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5]* 05/09/2001
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 05/09/2001
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41]* 05/09/2001
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 05/09/2001
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3]* 05/09/2001
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3]* 05/09/2001
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-2]* 05/09/2001
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 05/09/2001
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15]* 05/09/2001
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large]* 05/09/2001
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46]* 05/09/2001
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4]* 05/09/2001
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5]* 05/09/2001
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 05/09/2001
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 05/09/2001
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 05/09/2001
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 05/09/2001
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3]* 05/09/2001
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 05/09/2001
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 05/09/2001
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 05/21/2001
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 05/21/2001
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 05/21/2001
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 05/21/2001
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 05/21/2001
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 05/21/2001
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 05/25/2001
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 05/25/2001
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 05/25/2001
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 05/25/2001
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 05/25/2001
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-48] 05/25/2001
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 05/25/2001
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 05/25/2001
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 05/25/2001
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 05/25/2001
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15] 05/25/2001
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 06/14/2001
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 06/14/2001
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 06/14/2001
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 06/14/2001
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 06/14/2001
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 06/14/2001
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-1] 06/14/2001
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 06/14/2001
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 06/20/2001
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/20/2001
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 06/20/2001
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 06/20/2001
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 06/27/2001
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 06/27/2001
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 06/27/2001
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 07/18/2001
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 07/25/2001
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 11/16/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 12/18/2001
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 01/29/2002
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 04/11/2002
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 04/11/2002
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 05/02/2002
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 06/06/2002
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 06/06/2002
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 06/06/2002
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 06/06/2002
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 06/06/2002
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 06/21/2002
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 06/21/2002
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 06/21/2002
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 06/21/2002
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 06/21/2002
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/21/2002
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-2] 06/21/2002
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 06/21/2002
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 06/21/2002
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 07/08/2002
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/08/2002
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/09/2002
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 07/10/2002
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 07/10/2002
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 09/09/2002
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 09/19/2002
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 10/03/2002
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 11/14/2002
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 11/22/2002