Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5]* 05/09/2001
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 05/09/2001
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 05/09/2001
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 05/09/2001
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43]* 05/09/2001
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 05/09/2001
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11]* 05/09/2001
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 05/09/2001
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-48]* 05/09/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 05/09/2001
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 05/09/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 05/09/2001
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 05/09/2001
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 05/09/2001
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 05/09/2001
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-49]* 05/09/2001
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42]* 05/09/2001
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 05/09/2001
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 05/14/2001
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44] 05/14/2001
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 05/14/2001
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 05/15/2001
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 05/15/2001
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 05/15/2001
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/15/2001
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 05/16/2001
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 05/16/2001
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 05/16/2001
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/16/2001
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 05/16/2001
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 05/21/2001
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 05/21/2001
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 05/21/2001
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 05/24/2001
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 05/24/2001
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 05/24/2001
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 06/05/2001
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 06/05/2001
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 06/05/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/05/2001
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 06/05/2001
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 06/07/2001
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 06/07/2001
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 06/07/2001
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 06/14/2001
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27] 06/25/2001
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 07/11/2001
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 03/13/2002