Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 05/09/2001
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 05/09/2001
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11]* 05/09/2001
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 05/09/2001
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 05/09/2001
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 05/09/2001
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 05/09/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 05/09/2001
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 05/09/2001
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 05/09/2001
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 05/09/2001
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 05/09/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 05/09/2001
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 05/09/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5]* 05/09/2001
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7]* 05/09/2001
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 05/09/2001
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 05/09/2001
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 05/09/2001
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 05/09/2001
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 05/09/2001
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 05/09/2001
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 05/09/2001
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31]* 05/09/2001
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5]* 05/09/2001
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9]* 05/09/2001
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 05/09/2001
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 05/09/2001
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 05/09/2001
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25]* 05/09/2001
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 05/09/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 05/15/2001
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 05/15/2001
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 05/15/2001
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/15/2001
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 05/15/2001
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 06/25/2001
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 06/25/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/25/2001
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 06/25/2001
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-49] 06/25/2001
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 06/27/2001
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 06/27/2001
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 06/27/2001
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/27/2001
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 07/27/2001
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 07/27/2001
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 07/27/2001
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 07/31/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 07/31/2001
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 08/01/2001
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 08/01/2001
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 08/01/2001
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 09/06/2001
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 09/06/2001
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 09/06/2001
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 09/06/2001
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/06/2001
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 09/06/2001
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 09/06/2001
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 09/28/2001
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 09/28/2001
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 10/12/2001
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 10/12/2001
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 12/11/2001
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 12/11/2001
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 12/20/2001
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 02/04/2002
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 02/04/2002
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4] 02/04/2002
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 02/04/2002
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 02/04/2002
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 02/28/2002
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 02/28/2002
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 02/28/2002
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 02/28/2002
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 03/18/2002
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/19/2002
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 04/09/2002
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 04/09/2002
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/09/2002
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-32] 04/11/2002
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/11/2002
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 04/11/2002
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 04/15/2002
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 04/23/2002
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/29/2002
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 05/09/2002
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/10/2002
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 06/11/2002
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 06/17/2002
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 06/17/2002
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 06/17/2002
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 06/17/2002
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 06/17/2002
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/10/2002