Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1]* 05/09/2001
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 05/09/2001
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 05/09/2001
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24]* 05/09/2001
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 05/10/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 05/10/2001
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 05/10/2001
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 05/15/2001
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 05/15/2001
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 05/21/2001
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 05/21/2001
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 05/21/2001
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 05/21/2001
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 05/22/2001
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 05/22/2001
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5] 05/22/2001
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 05/22/2001
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 05/22/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 05/23/2001
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 05/24/2001
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 05/24/2001
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 05/25/2001
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 05/25/2001
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 06/12/2001
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 06/12/2001
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 06/12/2001
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 06/19/2001
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 06/19/2001
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 06/19/2001
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 06/21/2001
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 06/21/2001
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 09/10/2001
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 09/10/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 09/10/2001
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 09/10/2001
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 09/10/2001
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 09/10/2001
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 10/09/2001
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 10/09/2001
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 10/11/2001
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 10/30/2001
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 10/30/2001
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 11/05/2001
Rep. Sherwood, Don [R-PA-10] 11/14/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 11/16/2001
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 02/05/2002
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 06/17/2002
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 06/27/2002
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 07/24/2002
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 09/09/2002
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 09/11/2002
Rep. Thune, John [R-SD-At Large] 09/11/2002
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 09/11/2002
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 09/11/2002
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 09/17/2002
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 09/17/2002
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 09/18/2002
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 09/18/2002
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 09/19/2002
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 09/19/2002
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 09/24/2002
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 09/24/2002
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 09/26/2002
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 09/26/2002
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 10/01/2002
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 10/01/2002
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 10/01/2002
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 10/07/2002
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 10/07/2002
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 10/24/2002