Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 05/10/2001
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 05/10/2001
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 05/25/2001
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 05/25/2001
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 05/25/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 05/25/2001
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/25/2001
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 05/25/2001
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/25/2001
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 05/25/2001
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 05/25/2001
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 05/25/2001
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 05/25/2001
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 05/25/2001
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 05/25/2001
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 05/25/2001
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 05/25/2001
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 05/25/2001
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 05/25/2001
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 05/25/2001
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 05/25/2001
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 06/14/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 06/14/2001
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 06/14/2001
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 06/14/2001
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 06/14/2001
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 06/14/2001
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 06/14/2001
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 06/14/2001
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 06/14/2001
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/14/2001
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 06/14/2001
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 06/14/2001
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 06/14/2001
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 06/14/2001
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 06/19/2001
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 06/19/2001
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 06/19/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 06/26/2001
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 06/26/2001
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 06/26/2001
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 06/28/2001
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 06/28/2001
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 06/28/2001
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 07/10/2001
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 07/10/2001
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/10/2001
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 07/10/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 07/10/2001
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-1] 07/17/2001
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/17/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/17/2001
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-27] 07/17/2001
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/17/2001
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 07/17/2001
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 07/17/2001
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 07/19/2001
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 07/19/2001
Rep. Grucci, Felix J., Jr. [R-NY-1] 07/19/2001
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 07/19/2001
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 07/31/2001
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 07/31/2001
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 07/31/2001
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 09/06/2001
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 09/06/2001
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 09/06/2001
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 09/10/2001
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6] 09/10/2001
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 09/10/2001
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 09/10/2001
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 09/10/2001
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 09/21/2001
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-32] 09/21/2001
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3] 09/21/2001
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 10/17/2001
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 10/17/2001
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 11/06/2001
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 11/06/2001
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 12/05/2001
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27] 12/05/2001
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 12/05/2001
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 12/06/2001
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 12/11/2001
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 12/20/2001
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 01/29/2002
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 01/29/2002
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 01/29/2002
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 01/29/2002
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 02/05/2002
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 02/05/2002
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 02/05/2002
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 02/05/2002
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 02/05/2002
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 02/05/2002
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 02/05/2002
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 02/07/2002
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-2] 02/07/2002
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 02/07/2002
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-2] 02/12/2002
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 02/12/2002
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 02/12/2002
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 02/12/2002
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 02/12/2002
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 02/12/2002
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 02/13/2002
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 02/13/2002
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 02/13/2002
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 02/13/2002
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 02/13/2002
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 02/14/2002
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 02/14/2002
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 02/27/2002
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 02/27/2002
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 02/27/2002
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 02/27/2002
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 02/27/2002
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 02/27/2002
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 03/04/2002
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 03/04/2002
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 03/12/2002
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 03/12/2002
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 03/19/2002
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 03/19/2002
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 03/20/2002
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 03/20/2002
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11] 04/09/2002
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 04/09/2002
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 04/09/2002
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 04/09/2002
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/09/2002
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 04/09/2002
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 04/09/2002
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 04/09/2002
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 04/10/2002
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 04/10/2002
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 04/16/2002
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 04/16/2002
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 04/16/2002
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 04/23/2002
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 04/23/2002
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 04/23/2002
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 04/23/2002
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 04/25/2002
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 04/25/2002
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 04/25/2002
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 04/25/2002
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 04/25/2002
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 04/25/2002
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 04/25/2002
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 04/25/2002
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/02/2002
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 05/02/2002
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 05/02/2002
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 05/02/2002
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-49] 05/02/2002
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 05/02/2002
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 05/16/2002