There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Veterans Housing Fairness Act of 2001

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 38, United States Code, to provide housing loan benefits for the purchase of residential cooperative apartment units.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
05/10/2001Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
06/05/2001Referred to the Subcommittee on Benefits.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
05/10/2001Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/10/2001Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (76)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30]* 05/10/2001
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 05/24/2001
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 05/24/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 05/24/2001
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 05/24/2001
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 05/24/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 05/24/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 05/24/2001
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 05/24/2001
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 05/24/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/24/2001
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/12/2001
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 06/12/2001
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/12/2001
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 06/12/2001
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 06/12/2001
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 06/12/2001
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 06/21/2001
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 06/21/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 06/21/2001
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 06/28/2001
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/28/2001
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 07/18/2001
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 07/18/2001
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/18/2001
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 07/30/2001
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-27] 07/30/2001
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 07/30/2001
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 11/14/2001
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 11/14/2001
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 11/14/2001
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 11/14/2001
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 11/14/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 11/14/2001
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 11/14/2001
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 11/14/2001
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 11/14/2001
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 11/28/2001
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 11/28/2001
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 11/28/2001
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 12/11/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 01/29/2002
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 02/13/2002
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 04/09/2002
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 04/09/2002
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 04/09/2002
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 04/09/2002
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 04/09/2002
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 04/10/2002
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 04/10/2002
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 04/11/2002
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 04/16/2002
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/18/2002
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 04/23/2002
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 04/24/2002
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 04/25/2002
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 04/30/2002
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 04/30/2002
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 04/30/2002
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 04/30/2002
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 04/30/2002
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 04/30/2002
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 04/30/2002
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 05/07/2002
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 05/07/2002
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 05/16/2002
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 05/20/2002
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/21/2002
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 06/04/2002
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 06/05/2002
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 06/18/2002
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 07/22/2002
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 07/26/2002
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/26/2002
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31] 09/25/2002
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 10/01/2002

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs05/10/2001 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Benefits06/05/2001 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (10)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1808. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/10/2001)

Veterans Housing Fairness Act of 2001 - Authorizes the use of veterans' housing loan benefits to purchase stock or membership in a development, project, or structure (structure) of a cooperative housing corporation as long as such structure: (1) complies with criteria prescribed by the Secretary of Veterans Affairs; and (2) is a one-family residential unit.