Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1]* 05/10/2001
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9]* 05/10/2001
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 05/10/2001
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 05/10/2001
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 05/10/2001
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 05/16/2001
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 05/21/2001
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 05/21/2001
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/21/2001
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 05/23/2001
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/23/2001
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 05/23/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/23/2001
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 05/23/2001
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 05/24/2001
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 05/25/2001
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 05/25/2001
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 05/25/2001
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 05/25/2001
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/05/2001
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 06/05/2001
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 06/05/2001
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 06/05/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/05/2001
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/05/2001
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 06/05/2001
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 06/05/2001
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 06/05/2001
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 06/05/2001
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 06/05/2001
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/05/2001
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 06/05/2001
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/05/2001
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/05/2001
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 06/05/2001
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 06/07/2001
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 06/07/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 06/07/2001
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 06/07/2001
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 06/07/2001
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 06/07/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 06/07/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 06/12/2001
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 06/12/2001
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 06/12/2001
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 06/12/2001
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 06/12/2001
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 06/12/2001
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 06/12/2001
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/12/2001
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 06/12/2001
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 06/12/2001
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 06/12/2001
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 06/14/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 06/14/2001
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 06/14/2001
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 06/27/2001
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 06/27/2001
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 06/27/2001
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/27/2001
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 06/27/2001
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 06/27/2001
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 06/27/2001
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 06/27/2001
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/10/2001
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/10/2001
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/10/2001
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/10/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 07/10/2001
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 07/17/2001
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/19/2001
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 07/19/2001
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 07/19/2001
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 07/24/2001
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 08/02/2001
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 08/02/2001
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 09/06/2001
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 09/06/2001
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 09/06/2001
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 09/10/2001
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 10/02/2001
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 10/12/2001
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 11/01/2001
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 11/01/2001
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 11/08/2001
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 11/15/2001
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 11/15/2001
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 11/28/2001
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 11/28/2001
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 11/28/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 12/06/2001
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 12/12/2001
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 12/12/2001
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 12/20/2001
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 01/24/2002
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 01/24/2002
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 01/29/2002
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 01/29/2002
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 02/14/2002
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 02/14/2002
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 03/04/2002
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/04/2002
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 03/06/2002
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 03/06/2002
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 04/09/2002
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 04/23/2002
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 04/23/2002
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 04/23/2002
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 05/16/2002
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 06/05/2002
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 06/11/2002
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10] 09/04/2002