Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 05/10/2001
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 05/10/2001
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 05/10/2001
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 05/10/2001
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23]* 05/10/2001
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 05/10/2001
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31]* 05/10/2001
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8]* 05/10/2001
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 05/24/2001
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 06/19/2001
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 06/19/2001
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 06/19/2001
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 06/19/2001
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 06/19/2001
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 06/19/2001
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 06/19/2001
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 06/19/2001
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 06/19/2001
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/19/2001
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 06/19/2001
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 06/19/2001
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/19/2001
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 06/19/2001
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 06/19/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 06/19/2001
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 06/19/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/19/2001
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 06/19/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 06/19/2001
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 06/19/2001
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 06/19/2001
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/19/2001
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 06/19/2001
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 06/19/2001
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/19/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/19/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 06/19/2001
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 06/19/2001
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 06/19/2001
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 06/19/2001
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 06/19/2001
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 06/19/2001
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 06/19/2001
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/19/2001
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 06/19/2001
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 07/19/2001
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 07/19/2001
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 07/19/2001
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 07/19/2001
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/19/2001
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/19/2001
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 07/19/2001
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 07/19/2001
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 07/27/2001
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 07/27/2001
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 09/05/2001
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/05/2001
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 10/09/2001