Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2]* 05/10/2001
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6]* 05/10/2001
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 05/10/2001
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 05/10/2001
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 05/10/2001
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8]* 05/10/2001
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 06/27/2001
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 06/27/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/27/2001
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 06/27/2001
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 07/10/2001
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 07/17/2001
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 07/17/2001
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 07/17/2001
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 07/24/2001
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 07/24/2001
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 07/24/2001
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 07/25/2001
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 07/25/2001
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 07/30/2001
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 07/30/2001
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 08/02/2001
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 08/02/2001
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 08/02/2001
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 08/02/2001
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 09/05/2001
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-49] 09/05/2001
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 09/05/2001
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 09/05/2001
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 09/05/2001
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 09/21/2001
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/21/2001
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/21/2001
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 10/05/2001
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 10/05/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 10/05/2001
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 10/12/2001
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 10/12/2001
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 10/12/2001
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 11/01/2001
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 11/06/2001
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 11/14/2001
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 11/14/2001
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 11/14/2001
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 11/14/2001
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 11/28/2001
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 12/06/2001
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 12/20/2001
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 12/20/2001
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 01/24/2002
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 01/24/2002
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 01/24/2002
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 01/24/2002
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 01/24/2002
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 01/24/2002
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27] 02/06/2002
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 02/06/2002
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 02/07/2002
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 02/27/2002
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 03/13/2002
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 03/13/2002
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 03/13/2002
Rep. Grucci, Felix J., Jr. [R-NY-1] 03/20/2002
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/20/2002
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/20/2002
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 03/20/2002
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 03/20/2002
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 03/20/2002
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 03/20/2002
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 03/20/2002
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 03/20/2002
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 03/20/2002
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 04/09/2002
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 04/09/2002
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 04/09/2002
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 04/09/2002
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 04/09/2002
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 04/09/2002
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 04/09/2002
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 04/09/2002
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 04/09/2002
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 04/11/2002
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 04/17/2002
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 04/17/2002
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 04/17/2002
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 04/25/2002
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 04/25/2002
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 04/25/2002
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 04/25/2002
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 04/30/2002
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 05/08/2002
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 05/15/2002
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 05/15/2002
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/22/2002