Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 05/15/2001
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 05/15/2001
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3]* 05/15/2001
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 05/15/2001
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11]* 05/15/2001
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6]* 05/15/2001
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 05/15/2001
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 05/15/2001
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 05/15/2001
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 05/15/2001
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 05/15/2001
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 05/15/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4]* 05/15/2001
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2]* 05/15/2001
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 05/15/2001
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 05/15/2001
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30]* 05/15/2001
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 05/15/2001
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6]* 05/15/2001
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2]* 05/15/2001
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 05/17/2001
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 05/17/2001
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 05/24/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 05/24/2001
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 06/28/2001
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 06/28/2001
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 07/11/2001
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 07/17/2001
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 07/17/2001
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 07/17/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 07/17/2001
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 07/17/2001
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 07/19/2001
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 07/19/2001
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 07/19/2001
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 07/26/2001
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 09/21/2001
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 09/21/2001