Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 01/03/2001
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 01/30/2001
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 01/30/2001
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 01/30/2001
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 01/30/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 01/30/2001
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 01/30/2001
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 01/30/2001
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 01/30/2001
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 01/30/2001
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 01/30/2001
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 01/30/2001
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 02/06/2001
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 02/06/2001
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 02/06/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 02/06/2001
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 02/06/2001
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 02/06/2001
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 02/06/2001
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 02/08/2001
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 02/08/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 02/08/2001
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 02/13/2001
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 02/13/2001
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 02/27/2001
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 02/27/2001
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 02/27/2001
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 02/27/2001
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 03/06/2001
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 03/06/2001
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 03/06/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/06/2001
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 03/06/2001
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 03/06/2001
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/08/2001
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/15/2001
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 03/15/2001
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 03/20/2001
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 03/22/2001
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 03/28/2001
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/28/2001
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 03/28/2001
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 03/29/2001
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 03/29/2001
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 03/29/2001
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 04/03/2001
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 05/01/2001
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 05/03/2001
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 05/23/2001
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 05/23/2001
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 07/30/2001
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 09/05/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 09/20/2001
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/20/2001
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 12/04/2001
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 12/10/2001
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 02/26/2002
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/24/2002