Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 05/15/2001
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18]* 05/15/2001
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 05/15/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 05/15/2001
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large]* 05/15/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 05/15/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 05/15/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 05/15/2001
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27] 06/19/2001
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 07/23/2001
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 09/25/2001
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 10/03/2001