There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Small Business Technology Transfer Program Reauthorization Act of 2001

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Small Business Technology Transfer Program Reauthorization Act of 2001

Short Titles as Reported to House

Small Business Technology Transfer Program Reauthorization Act of 2001

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To reauthorize the Small Business Technology Transfer Program, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (8)

Date
10/15/2001 Became Public Law No: 107-50. (TXT | PDF)
10/15/2001 Signed by President.
10/03/2001 Presented to President.
09/26/2001 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S9856)
09/24/2001 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H5936-5937)
09/21/2001 Committee on Science discharged.
09/21/2001 Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Small Business. H. Rept. 107-213, Part I.
05/16/2001 Introduced in House

All Actions (21)

Date Chamber
10/15/2001 Became Public Law No: 107-50. (TXT | PDF)
10/15/2001 Signed by President.
10/03/2001 House Presented to President.
09/26/2001 Senate Message on Senate action sent to the House.
09/26/2001 Senate Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S9856)
09/25/2001 Senate Received in the Senate, read twice.
09/24/2001-2:41pm House Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/24/2001-2:41pm House On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5936-5937)
09/24/2001-2:18pm House DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1860.
09/24/2001-2:18pm House Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5936-5941)
09/24/2001-2:17pm House Mr. Manzullo moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
09/21/2001 House Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 128.
09/21/2001 House Committee on Science discharged.
09/21/2001 House House Committee on Science Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than Sept. 21, 2001.
09/21/2001 House Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Small Business. H. Rept. 107-213, Part I.
Action By: Committee on Small Business
09/20/2001 House Subcommittee on Environment, Technology, and Standards Discharged.
Action By: Committee on Science
05/18/2001 House Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment, Technology, and Standards.
Action By: Committee on Science
05/16/2001 House Referred to House Science
05/16/2001 House Referred to House Small Business
05/16/2001 House Referred to the Committee on Small Business, and in addition to the Committee on Science, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
05/16/2001 House Introduced in House

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5]* 05/16/2001
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 08/02/2001
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 08/02/2001

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Small Business05/16/2001 Referred to
09/21/2001 Reported by H. Rept. 107-213
House Science05/16/2001 Referred to
09/21/2001 Discharged from
House Science Subcommittee on Environment, Technology, and Standards05/18/2001 Referred to
09/20/2001 Discharged from

Related Bills (1)

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.

Subjects (33)

  • Administrative procedure
  • Authorization
  • Commercialization
  • Congressional reporting requirements
  • Data banks
  • Economic development
  • Federal aid to research
  • Government and business
  • Government paperwork
  • Indian economic development
  • Intellectual property
  • Marketing
  • Minorities
  • Minority business enterprises
  • Performance measurement
  • Research and development
  • Research and development contracts
  • Research centers
  • Rural economic development
  • Small Business Administration
  • Small business
  • Technology transfer
  • Urban affairs
  • Urban economic development
  • Women
  • Women in business

Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.1860. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (09/24/2001)

Small Business Technology Transfer Program Reauthorization Act of 2001 - Amends the Small Business Act to: (1) increase and extend through FY 2009 the authorization of appropriations for the Small Business Technology Transfer (STTR) Program; (2) increase to $750,000 the maximum award for small businesses participating in the second phase of an STTR Program; (3) require each Federal agency that is required to establish an STTR Program to implement an outreach program to research institutions and small businesses; (4) require the Administrator of the Small Business Administration (SBA) to modify a certain SBA policy directive with respect to Federal funding awards; (5) require each of the above agencies to collect and maintain information necessary to assess its STTR Program; (6) require STTR information to be included in agency databases currently maintaining Small Business Innovation Research (SBIR) program information; and (7) require STTR information to be included in such agencies' congressional reporting requirements.

(Sec. 6) Requires the Administrator to include within an annual report on SBIR and STTR programs the number of proposals received from, and total amounts awarded to, HUBZone small businesses under each program.

(Sec. 7) Directs the Administrator to promulgate regulations to establish a single model agreement for use in the STTR program that allocates between small businesses and research institutions intellectual property rights and any rights to carry out follow-on research, development, or commercialization. Requires each Federal agency that adopts an STTR program to adopt such model agreement.

(Sec. 8) Revises provisions concerning the Federal and State Technology Partnership Program (a program to strengthen the technological competitiveness of small businesses) to require the Administrator and the SBIR Program managers to consider whether an SBIR Program proposal addresses the needs of small businesses owned and controlled by women and minorities located in areas not participating in SBIR and STTR programs. Requires the Administrator to promulgate regulations establishing standards for the consideration of such proposals.