Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 05/16/2001
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 05/16/2001
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2]* 05/16/2001
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 05/16/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10]* 05/16/2001
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3]* 05/16/2001
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 05/16/2001
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22]* 05/16/2001
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 05/16/2001
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 05/16/2001
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18]* 05/16/2001
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 05/16/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 05/16/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 05/16/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 05/16/2001
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4]* 05/16/2001
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8]* 05/16/2001
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 05/16/2001
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 05/16/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 05/16/2001
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13]* 05/16/2001
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6]* 05/16/2001
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 05/16/2001
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6]* 05/16/2001
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 05/16/2001
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9]* 05/16/2001
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 05/16/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 05/16/2001
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 05/16/2001
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19]* 05/16/2001
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 05/16/2001
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 05/16/2001
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5]* 05/16/2001
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 05/16/2001
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20]* 05/16/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 05/16/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 05/16/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4]* 05/16/2001
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 05/16/2001
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 05/16/2001
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 05/16/2001
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 05/16/2001
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 05/16/2001
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5]* 05/16/2001
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15]* 05/16/2001
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28]* 05/16/2001
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46]* 05/16/2001
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 05/16/2001
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 05/16/2001
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20]* 05/16/2001
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6]* 05/16/2001
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 05/16/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 05/16/2001
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 05/16/2001
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 05/16/2001
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 05/16/2001
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 05/16/2001
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 05/22/2001
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 05/22/2001
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 05/22/2001
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31] 05/22/2001
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 05/23/2001
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3] 05/23/2001
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 06/05/2001
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 06/05/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 06/12/2001
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 06/28/2001
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 07/12/2001
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 07/12/2001
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/17/2001
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/23/2001
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 07/24/2001
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 08/02/2001
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 09/05/2001
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/05/2001
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 09/05/2001
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 09/05/2001
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 10/12/2001
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 03/05/2002
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 04/30/2002
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 05/14/2002
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/15/2002