Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23]* 01/03/2001
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 01/30/2001
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 01/30/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 02/06/2001
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 02/06/2001
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 02/06/2001
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 02/06/2001
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 02/06/2001
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 02/06/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 02/06/2001
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 02/13/2001
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 02/13/2001
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 02/14/2001
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 02/27/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 02/27/2001
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 02/27/2001
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 02/27/2001
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 02/27/2001
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 02/27/2001
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 03/06/2001
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 03/06/2001
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 03/06/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/15/2001
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 03/15/2001
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 03/15/2001
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/20/2001
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 03/22/2001
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 03/22/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 03/22/2001
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 04/24/2001
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 07/24/2002
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 07/24/2002