Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/13/2001
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 06/19/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 06/19/2001
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 06/19/2001
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 06/19/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/19/2001
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 06/19/2001
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 07/10/2001
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 07/17/2001
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 08/01/2001
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 08/01/2001
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/09/2002