Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 05/17/2001
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 06/07/2001
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 06/07/2001
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 06/07/2001
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 06/07/2001
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 06/07/2001
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 06/07/2001
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 06/07/2001
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 06/14/2001
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 06/14/2001
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 06/14/2001
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 06/14/2001
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 06/14/2001
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-2] 06/14/2001
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 06/14/2001
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 06/14/2001
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 06/14/2001
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 06/14/2001
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/25/2001
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 06/25/2001
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 06/25/2001
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 06/25/2001
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 06/25/2001
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 06/25/2001
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 06/25/2001
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 07/10/2001
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 07/10/2001
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 07/10/2001
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 07/10/2001
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 07/10/2001
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 07/10/2001
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 07/10/2001
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 07/10/2001
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 07/10/2001
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11] 07/11/2001
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 07/16/2001
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 07/16/2001
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 07/25/2001
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 11/28/2001
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 11/28/2001