There are 8 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (6)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Family Sponsor Immigration Act of 2002

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Family Sponsor Immigration Act of 2001

Short Titles as Reported to House

Family Sponsor Immigration Act of 2001

Short Titles as Introduced

Family Sponsor Immigration Act of 2001

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Family Sponsor Immigration Act of 2001

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Immigration and Nationality Act to provide for the acceptance of an affidavit of support from another eligible sponsor if the original sponsor has died and the Attorney General has determined for humanitarian reasons that the original sponsor's classification petition should not be revoked.


Actions Overview (9)

Date
03/13/2002Became Public Law No: 107-150. (TXT | PDF)
03/13/2002Signed by President.
03/01/2002Presented to President.
02/26/2002Resolving differences -- House actions: On motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 404 - 3 (Roll no. 39).
12/20/2001Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S14064-14065; text as passed Senate: CR S14064)
12/13/2001Committee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Leahy with an amendment. Without written report.
07/23/2001Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 379 - 0 (Roll no. 258).(text: CR H4395)
07/10/2001Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 107-127.
05/17/2001Introduced in House

All Actions (30)

Date Chamber
03/13/2002Became Public Law No: 107-150. (TXT | PDF)
03/13/2002Signed by President.
03/01/2002HousePresented to President.
02/26/2002-6:56pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
02/26/2002-6:56pmHouseOn motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 404 - 3 (Roll no. 39).
02/26/2002-2:23pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 5, rule I, the chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
02/26/2002-2:11pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on the motion to suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment to H.R. 1892.
02/26/2002-2:11pmHouseMr. Sensenbrenner moved that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment. (consideration: CR H527-529, H536)
01/23/2002SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/20/2001SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S14064-14065; text as passed Senate: CR S14064)
12/13/2001SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 289.
12/13/2001SenateCommittee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Leahy with an amendment. Without written report.
12/13/2001SenateCommittee on the Judiciary. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably.
07/24/2001SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
07/23/2001-6:35pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/23/2001-6:35pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 379 - 0 (Roll no. 258). (text: CR H4395)
07/23/2001-6:25pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H4403-4404)
07/23/2001-3:25pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
07/23/2001-2:57pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1892.
07/23/2001-2:57pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4395-4399)
07/23/2001-2:57pmHouseMr. Sensenbrenner moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
07/10/2001HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 72.
07/10/2001HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 107-127.
06/26/2001HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
06/26/2001HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
06/06/2001HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: House Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration and Claims
06/06/2001HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration and Claims
05/30/2001HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Claims.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
05/17/2001HouseReferred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
05/17/2001HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary05/17/2001 Referred to
06/26/2001 Markup by
07/10/2001 Reported by H. Rept. 107-127
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration and Claims05/30/2001 Referred to
06/06/2001 Markup by
06/06/2001 Reported by
Senate Judiciary07/24/2001 Referred to
12/13/2001 Markup by
12/13/2001 Reported by

No related bill information was received for H.R.1892.


Subjects (15)


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.R.1892. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to Senate with amendment(s) (12/13/2001)

Family Sponsor Immigration Act of 2001 - Amends the Immigration and Nationality Act to permit the acceptance of a signed affidavit of support (to establish that an alien is not excludable as a public charge) from another eligible family sponsor (including sister-in-law or brother-in-law) of the alien upon the death of the original sponsor-petitioner (after acceptance of the petition but before signing the affidavit of support) if the Attorney General determines for humanitarian reasons that the original sponsor's classification petition should not be revoked.

Sets forth specified requirements respecting such provisions' application in the case of an original sponsor who dies prior to enactment of this Act.