Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44]* 05/17/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 05/17/2001
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 05/25/2001
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 05/25/2001
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 05/25/2001
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 05/25/2001
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 05/25/2001
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 05/25/2001
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 05/25/2001
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 05/25/2001
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/25/2001
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/25/2001
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 05/25/2001
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/07/2001
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/07/2001
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 06/07/2001
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 06/07/2001
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 06/07/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/07/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/07/2001
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 06/07/2001
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/14/2001
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 06/14/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 06/14/2001
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 06/28/2001
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 06/28/2001
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 06/28/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 06/28/2001
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 06/28/2001
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 06/28/2001
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/28/2001
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 06/28/2001
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 07/12/2001
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 07/12/2001
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 07/12/2001
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 07/12/2001
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 07/12/2001
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 07/12/2001
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 07/12/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 07/24/2001
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/24/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 07/24/2001
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/24/2001
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 07/24/2001
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 07/24/2001
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 07/24/2001
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 07/24/2001
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 07/24/2001
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 07/24/2001
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 07/27/2001
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 07/27/2001
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 08/02/2001
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 08/02/2001
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 08/02/2001
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 09/06/2001
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/06/2001
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 09/06/2001
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 09/21/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 09/25/2001
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 12/19/2001
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 12/19/2001
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 12/19/2001
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 04/11/2002
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 05/09/2002
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 05/21/2002
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 06/24/2002