Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3]* 05/17/2001
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 09/05/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/05/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 09/05/2001
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 09/05/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 09/05/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 09/05/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 09/05/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 09/05/2001
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 09/05/2001
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 09/05/2001
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 09/05/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 09/05/2001
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 09/05/2001
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 09/05/2001
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 09/05/2001
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 09/05/2001
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 09/05/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/20/2001
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 10/02/2001
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31] 10/10/2001
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 01/23/2002
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 01/23/2002
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 01/24/2002
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 02/06/2002
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 02/06/2002
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 02/12/2002
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 02/12/2002
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 02/12/2002
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 02/13/2002
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 02/27/2002
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 02/27/2002
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 02/27/2002
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 02/27/2002
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 02/27/2002
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/06/2002
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/06/2002
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/06/2002
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 03/06/2002
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-32] 03/06/2002
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/06/2002
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 03/06/2002
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 03/07/2002
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 03/07/2002
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/07/2002
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 03/07/2002
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 03/12/2002
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 03/12/2002
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 03/12/2002
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 03/12/2002
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 03/18/2002
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 03/18/2002
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 03/18/2002
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 03/18/2002
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 03/18/2002
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 03/19/2002
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/20/2002
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 03/20/2002
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 04/09/2002
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 04/09/2002
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 04/09/2002
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 04/09/2002
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 04/09/2002
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 04/09/2002
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 04/09/2002
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 04/09/2002
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 04/09/2002
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 04/09/2002
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/09/2002
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 04/11/2002
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 04/11/2002
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 04/11/2002
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 04/23/2002
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 04/23/2002
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 04/23/2002
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 04/30/2002
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 05/01/2002
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 05/08/2002
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 05/14/2002
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 05/15/2002
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 05/21/2002
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 06/05/2002
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 06/13/2002
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 06/18/2002
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 07/22/2002
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/24/2002
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27] 10/10/2002
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 11/19/2002
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 11/19/2002