Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 05/24/2001
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 05/24/2001
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 05/24/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 05/24/2001
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 06/05/2001
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 06/05/2001
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/05/2001
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 06/05/2001
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 06/05/2001
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 06/07/2001
Rep. Grucci, Felix J., Jr. [R-NY-1] 06/07/2001
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 06/12/2001
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 06/12/2001
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 06/12/2001
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 06/20/2001
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 10/16/2001