Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1]* 05/17/2001
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 05/17/2001
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 05/17/2001
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 05/17/2001
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 06/05/2001
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 06/07/2001
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 06/12/2001
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 06/13/2001
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5] 06/19/2001
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 06/19/2001
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/20/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/25/2001
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/25/2001
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 06/25/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 07/10/2001
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 07/16/2001
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 07/17/2001
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 07/23/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/23/2001
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 07/23/2001
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 09/05/2001
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 09/05/2001
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 09/14/2001
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 09/21/2001
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 09/25/2001
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 10/12/2001
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 12/05/2001
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27] 12/05/2001
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 03/12/2002
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 03/12/2002
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 03/12/2002
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-2] 03/12/2002
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 03/12/2002
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 03/12/2002
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 04/09/2002
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 04/10/2002
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 04/18/2002
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 04/18/2002
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 04/23/2002
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 05/21/2002
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 06/05/2002
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 06/17/2002
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 09/09/2002
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 09/09/2002
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 09/17/2002
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 10/01/2002