There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Student Adjustment Act of 2001

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Illegal Immigration Reform and Immigrant Responsibility Act of 1996 to permit States to determine state residency for higher education purposes and to amend the Immigration and Nationality Act to cancel the removal and adjust the status of certain alien college-bound students who are long-term U.S. residents.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
05/21/2001Introduced in House

All Actions (6)

Date All Actions
07/20/2001Referred to the Subcommittee on 21st Century Competitiveness.
Action By: Committee on Education and the Workforce
05/30/2001Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Claims.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
05/21/2001Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Education and the Workforce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/21/2001Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Education and the Workforce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/21/2001Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Education and the Workforce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/21/2001Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (62)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 05/21/2001
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33]* 05/21/2001
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 07/27/2001
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 08/02/2001
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 08/02/2001
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 09/25/2001
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 09/25/2001
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 09/25/2001
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 09/25/2001
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/25/2001
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 09/25/2001
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 09/25/2001
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 09/25/2001
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 09/25/2001
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 09/25/2001
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 09/25/2001
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 09/25/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 09/25/2001
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 09/25/2001
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31] 09/25/2001
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 09/25/2001
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/25/2001
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 09/25/2001
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 09/25/2001
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 09/25/2001
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 09/25/2001
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 09/25/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/25/2001
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 09/25/2001
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 09/25/2001
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 11/28/2001
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/23/2002
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 07/23/2002
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/23/2002
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/23/2002
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 07/23/2002
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 07/23/2002
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 09/10/2002
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 09/10/2002
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 09/10/2002
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 09/12/2002
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 09/12/2002
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 09/17/2002
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 09/19/2002
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 09/19/2002
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 09/19/2002
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/19/2002
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 09/30/2002
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 09/30/2002
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 09/30/2002
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/30/2002
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 09/30/2002
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 10/01/2002
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 10/02/2002
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 10/09/2002
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 10/10/2002
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 10/10/2002
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 10/24/2002
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 10/24/2002
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 10/24/2002
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 10/31/2002
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 11/13/2002

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary05/21/2001 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration and Claims05/30/2001 Referred to
House Education and the Workforce05/21/2001 Referred to
House Education and the Workforce Subcommittee on 21st Century Competitiveness07/20/2001 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.1918.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1918. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/21/2001)

Student Adjustment Act of 2001 - Amends the Illegal Immigration Reform and Immigrant Responsibility Act of 1996 to repeal the provision prohibiting an unlawful alien's eligibility for higher education benefits based on State residence unless a U.S. national is similarly eligible without regard to such State residence.

Amends the Immigration and Nationality Act to direct the Attorney General to cancel the removal of, and adjust to permanent resident status, certain (inadmissible or deportable) alien middle or secondary students with qualifying years of U.S. residency. Makes such aliens eligible for Federal and State higher education assistance during the pendency of their application for cancellation of removal.