Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 05/21/2001
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5]* 05/21/2001
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 05/21/2001
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 05/21/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10]* 05/21/2001
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 05/21/2001
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 05/21/2001
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 05/21/2001
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 05/21/2001
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 05/21/2001
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 05/21/2001
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 05/21/2001
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 05/21/2001
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 05/21/2001
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 05/21/2001
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14]* 05/21/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 05/21/2001
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 05/21/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 05/21/2001
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 05/21/2001
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5]* 05/21/2001
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 05/21/2001
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 05/21/2001
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/24/2001
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 05/24/2001
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 06/07/2001
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 06/07/2001
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 06/07/2001
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31] 06/12/2001
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/14/2001
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 06/19/2001
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 07/11/2001