Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 05/21/2001
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 05/21/2001
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 05/21/2001
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 05/21/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10]* 05/21/2001
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2]* 05/21/2001
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42]* 05/21/2001
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 05/21/2001
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 05/21/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 05/21/2001
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 05/21/2001
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 05/21/2001
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 05/21/2001
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18]* 05/21/2001
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 05/22/2001
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 05/22/2001
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/22/2001
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/22/2001
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 05/22/2001
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 05/22/2001
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 05/22/2001
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 05/25/2001
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/25/2001
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 05/25/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 05/25/2001
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 05/25/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 06/07/2001
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 06/07/2001
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 06/07/2001
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/07/2001
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/07/2001
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/07/2001
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/07/2001
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 06/07/2001
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 06/07/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 06/07/2001
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 06/07/2001
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 06/07/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/07/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/14/2001
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 06/14/2001
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 06/14/2001
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/14/2001