Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10]* 05/22/2001
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22]* 05/22/2001
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 05/22/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 05/22/2001
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 05/22/2001
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 06/26/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 07/10/2001
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 07/10/2001
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 07/10/2001
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 08/01/2001
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 09/13/2001
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 11/16/2001