Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11]* 05/22/2001
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 05/22/2001
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 05/22/2001
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 05/22/2001
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 05/22/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 06/05/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/12/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/19/2001
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/10/2001
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 09/09/2002